THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE FIND A DOCTOR SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA

Date: 17/07/2018 9:24:26 AM

Garcia, Yelian (CPSO#: 88666)

Current Status: Suspended as of 07 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Oct 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yelian Garcia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Garcia ( CPSO# 88666 )

Business Address:
15055 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 6T4

Business Address:
270 Doak Lane
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A5

Business Address:
784 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 9G7

Business Address:
Yorkdale Medical Clinic
11685 Yonge Street
Room A103
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0K7
Phone Number: (905) 770-9057

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical and
Urgent Care Centre
13291 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 07 Feb 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Feb 2017
Summary:

On February 15, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yelian Garcia committed an act 
of professional misconduct in that:  he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and, he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 

Failing to Maintain the Standard of Practice 

After graduating from medical school and completing a residency program through McMaster 
University, Dr. Garcia practised under a restricted certificate of registration between August 18, 
2011 and January 12, 2012. During this time, he practised family medicine under the supervision 
of a physician at Wellington Medical Centre in Aurora, and under the supervision of a second 
physician at Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care Centre in Richmond Hill. 

Dr. Garcia obtained his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in January of 
2012. Dr. Garcia continued to provide family medicine and walk-in services at Wellington 
Medical Centre and urgent care services at Oak Ridges Urgent Care Centre. He also began 
providing urgent care and walk-in services at One Care Medical Clinic in Scarborough and 
Woodbridge Urgent Care Centre in Woodbridge, as well as providing medical care to patients at 
three long-term/residential care facilities. 

According to Dr. Garcia, he was seeing on average 10 to 13 patients per hour at the Wellington 
Medical Centre in 2012. Because of this, Dr. Garcia would chart pertinent information during 
patient encounters and complete 50 to 70% of his charts at the end of the day. Dr. Garcia tried to 
be as efficient as possible while ensuring an evidence-based practice. He conducted some patient 
examinations and assessments very quickly in 2012. 

There was a pharmacy located in the same premises as the Wellington Medical Centre. In the 
summer of 2012, a pharmacist at the pharmacy expressed concern about Dr. Garcia’s narcotic 
prescribing practices to both Dr. Garcia and the physician who had supervised him at Wellington 
Medical Centre (“the supervising physician”). 

In the late summer and fall of 2012, the supervising physician reviewed the charts for most of the 
approximately dozen patients to whom Dr. Garcia was prescribing narcotics or opioids at the 
Wellington Medical Centre, met with several of these patients, along with Dr. Garcia, and 
conducted an assessment of each patient’s pain and the appropriateness of the narcotics 
prescriptions given by Dr. Garcia. Following this process, several patients seen together by the 
supervising physician and Dr. Garcia were referred to a pain clinic, specialist or detoxification 
program. 

In May 2013, the supervising physician contacted the College to report his concerns about the 
medical care provided by Dr. Garcia. 

Following receipt of this information, the College began an investigation into Dr. Garcia’s 
practice. The College obtained medical records with respect to 36 patients. Review by a medical 
inspector retained by the College concluded that Dr. Garcia provided very fine medical care to 
                                   1 

some patients and that Dr. Garcia failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
his care of other patients. 

Dr. Garcia acknowledged during the College investigation that he should slow down in terms of 
the manner in which he assessed and communicated with patients. Dr. Garcia also stated that his 
practice had changed since 2012 and early 2013, and that he had tried to slow down his patient 
interactions and communicate more effectively with patients. Dr. Garcia acknowledged during 
the College investigation that he was “duped” by a couple of patients who were engaged in drug-
seeking behaviour and that he was too trusting of patients who were seeking narcotics for pain 
medication. At that time, Dr. Garcia also stated that he had learned to be less trusting of patients 
and that he no longer had patients with chronic pain in his family practice. 
 
Dr. Garcia failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession with respect to eleven 
patients. The deficiencies noted included: 
 
-  not obtaining an adequate history or doing a proper physical examination of a patient who 
   complained of “chronic pain”; 
-  for several patients, not recording any physical examination and not recording details about 
   the source or type of pain they experienced; 
-  prescribing narcotics to pain patients without taking a proper and full history and without 
   doing any physical examination; 
-  early renewal of narcotic prescriptions without a notation in the chart to explain why the 
   medication was renewed early;  
-  regarding one patient who was given a typhoid immunization, Dr. Garcia made no notes of 
   this appointment in the chart and no record was kept of the drug identification number or lot 
   number for the vaccine given. 
-  regarding one patient, Dr. Garcia’s charting was moderately below standard. Dr. Garcia’s 
   typed note for a visit incorrectly indicated he gave the patient a typhoid shot, although his 
   handwritten note correctly indicated that he gave patient N an allergy shot on that date.  
 
The medical inspector expressed concern that Dr. Garcia’s general patient population was put at 
risk because of his willingness to prescribe narcotics and repeated inability to detect the misuse 
of opioid medication. 

Disgraceful, Dishonourable or Unprofessional Conduct 
 
The Committee also found that Dr. Garcia has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
First, the Committee found that Dr. Garcia prescribed medications and provided a medical 
service to Ms. A, a woman who was not a patient and with whom he had a personal and romantic 
relationship. Dr. Garcia prescribed medications to Ms. A on three occasions. On one of those 
occasions, he prescribed an IUD and referred Ms. A to a gynecologist to perform the IUD 
insertion. There was no record of an assessment, including a history and physical examination, 
prior to providing any of the prescriptions. The policy statement on Treating Self and Family 
                                   2 

Members clearly states when it is permissible to treat a family member or another individual 
whom the physician has a personal or emotional involvement. As stated in the Policy: 
“Physicians should not treat either themselves or family members, except for a minor condition 
or in an emergency situation and when another qualified healthcare professional is not readily 
available.” These conditions were not present on the occasions when Dr. Garcia chose to 
prescribe medications, an IUD and provide a medical service to Ms. A. When a physician treats 
someone with whom they have a personal/emotional relationship, there is a risk that the 
relationship will affect the doctor’s ability to provide quality care. Further, as Ms. A’s romantic 
partner, Dr. Garcia placed himself in a conflict of interest by providing Ms. A with a prescription 
and a referral for insertion of an IUD for birth control. 
 
Second, during Ms. A’s hospitalization, Dr. Garcia used his professional status as a physician in 
an attempt to persuade or pressure a nurse to provide confidential information in regard to Ms. A 
without her consent, despite the fact that he, as a physician, had full knowledge that he was not 
entitled to that information.  
 
Disposition 
 
On January 24, 2018 the Committee ordered that: 
 
1. Dr. Garcia appear before the Committee to be reprimanded. 
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Garcia’s Certificate of Registration for a period 
   of eight (8) months, to commence at 12:01 a.m. on February 7, 2018. 
3. the Registrar  impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on 
   Dr. Garcia’s Certificate of Registration:  
           
Restriction 
(a) Dr. Garcia shall have clinical interactions with no more than a total of forty-eight 
   (48) patients per day, at a rate of no more than six (6) patients per hour within each 
   hour; 
Patient Log 
(b) At each of his Practice Locations, Dr. Garcia shall maintain an up-to-date daily log of 
   every patient with whom he has a clinical interaction, which shall include the 
   patient’s name, the date, and the hour within which the clinical interaction occurred 
   (“Patient Log”). Dr. Garcia shall maintain the original Patient Log and shall send a 
   copy to the College at the end of every calendar month; 
(c) At its sole discretion, the College may require Dr. Garcia to implement other 
   measures to ensure the accuracy of the Patient Log, including but not limited to 
   requiring him to have the Patient Log reviewed and/or approved by a person or 
   persons approved by the College; 
Prescribing Log 
(d) Dr. Garcia shall keep a log of all prescriptions (the “Prescribing Log”) for: 
    (i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
        Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended from time 
        to time); 
                                   3 

    (ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under 
        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended from 
        time to time); 
    (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the 
        Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended from time to time);  
    (iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines 
        and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs 
        and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended from time to time);  
        (A current summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the 
        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as 
        Schedule “A”; and the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule 
        “B”) 
    (v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and 
        Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule “C” and as 
        amended from time to time);  
(e) The Prescribing Log shall be in the form set out at Schedule “D”, which will include 
   at least the following information:   
    (i) the date of the prescription; 
    (ii) the name of the patient with chart / file number; 
    (iii) the medication, dose, direction, number of tablets to be dispensed and 
        frequency (if applicable); 
    (iv) the clinical indication for use; 
    (v) whether it is a new prescription; and  
    (vi) physician initials. 
(f) Dr. Garcia shall keep a copy of all prescriptions written for all Narcotic Drugs, 
   Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted 
   Substances and all other Monitored Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart. 
Instruction in Medical Ethics 
(g) At his own expense, Dr. Garcia shall participate in and successfully complete 
   individualized instruction in ethics approved by the College, at the instructor’s 
   earliest availability. Dr. Garcia will provide proof of successful completion within 
   three (3) weeks of completing the instruction. The instruction will involve one-on-
   one sessions with a College-approved instructor, incorporating principles of guided 
   reflection, tailored feedback, and other modalities customized to the specific needs of 
   Dr. Garcia as assessed by the instructor.  The instructor will report to the College 
   regarding Dr. Garcia’s progress and compliance.  
Instruction in Maintaining Boundaries 
(h) At his own expense, Dr. Garcia shall participate in and successfully complete the 
   next available course on “Understanding Boundaries and Managing the Risks 
   Inherent in the Doctor-Patient Relationship” offered by Western University, or an 
   equivalent program acceptable to the College, and shall forthwith thereafter provide 
   proof of completion thereof to the College. 
Clinical Supervision 
(i) Prior to resuming practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration 
   described above in paragraph 2, Dr. Garcia shall retain, at his own expense, a clinical 
                                   4 

   supervisor or supervisors (the “Clinical Supervisor”) acceptable to the College, who 
   will sign an undertaking in the form attached hereto as Schedule “E”;   
(j) For a period of twelve (12) months, commencing as of the date Dr. Garcia resumes 
   practice following the suspension of his certificate of registration described above in 
   paragraph 2, Dr. Garcia may practice only under the supervision of the Clinical 
   Supervisor (“Clinical Supervision”). Clinical Supervision of Dr. Garcia’s practice 
   shall contain the following elements: 
   Chart Review: 
    i.  All charts reviewed shall be independently selected by the Clinical Supervisor 
        without the participation of Dr. Garcia. 
    Phase 1 of Chart Review 
     ii. For a minimum of two (2) months, Dr. Garcia and the Clinical Supervisor will 
        meet at least once every week to discuss the Clinical Supervisor’s review of the 
        elements set out in (v), below. 
    iii. After a minimum of two (2) months of Phase 1 of Chart Review, if the Clinical 
        Supervisor is satisfied that Dr. Garcia has the necessary knowledge, skills and 
        judgment to practice in a less highly supervised environment, the Clinical 
        Supervisor may recommend to the College that the chart review component of 
        supervision be reduced. 
    Phase 2 of Chart Review 
     iv. Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval of the 
        College, the chart review component of clinical supervision will be reduced. 
        Dr. Garcia and the Clinical Supervisor will continue to meet at least once every 
        month to discuss the Clinical Supervisor’s review of the elements set out in (v) 
        below. 
    Elements of Chart Review 
     v. At each meeting described in (ii) and (iv) above, Dr. Garcia and the Clinical 
        Supervisor will discuss the Clinical Supervisor’s review of: 
          (a) The Prescribing Log; 
          (b) 20 charts, selected as follows: 
          ?   5 charts selected from Dr. Garcia’s clinic practice; 
          ?   5 charts selected from Dr. Garcia’s long-term care/retirement home 
              practice; and 
          ?   10 charts of patients to whom Dr. Garcia has prescribed Narcotic 
              Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and 
              Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs since the 
              Clinical Supervisor’s prior review; or 
          ?   If there are fewer than 10 patients listed in the Prescribing Log to whom 
              Dr. Garcia has prescribed Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, 
              Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and 
              All other Monitored Drugs since the Clinical Supervisor’s prior review, 
              then the charts of all patients listed in the Prescribing Log and 
              additional charts selected from both Dr. Garcia’s clinic and long-term 
              care/retirement home practices, resulting in a total of 10 charts. 
          (c) The chart of every patient to whom Dr. Garcia has issued a new 
              prescription for a Narcotic Drug, Narcotic Preparation, Controlled 
                                5 

           Drug, Benzodiazepine and Other Targeted Substance or other 
           Monitored Drug since the Supervisor’s prior review. 
 Direct Observation 
 Phase 1 of Direct Observation 
  vi. For a minimum of one (1) month, the Clinical Supervisor shall directly observe 
     Dr. Garcia in practice for ½ day (3.5 hours) at least once per week; 
 vii. During Phase 1 of Direct Observation, the Clinical Supervisor’s observation of 
     Dr. Garcia’s practice shall rotate between Dr. Garcia’s clinical practice and his 
     long-term care/retirement home practice; 
viii. For greater clarity, during Phase 1 of Direct Observation, the Clinical 
     Supervisor shall observe Dr. Garcia in practice at least twice in his clinic 
     setting and at least twice in his long-term care/retirement home practice; 
  ix. After a minimum of one (1) month of Phase 1 of Direct Observation, if the 
     Clinical Supervisor is satisfied that Dr. Garcia has the necessary knowledge, 
     skills and judgment to practice in a less highly supervised environment, the 
     Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the College that the direct observation 
     component of supervision be reduced; 
 Phase 2 of Direct Observation 
  x. Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval of the 
     College, the direct observation component of Clinical Supervision will be 
     reduced and will take place on the following terms: For a minimum of two (2) 
     months, the Clinical Supervisor shall directly observe Dr. Garcia in practice for 
     ½ day (3.5 hours) at least once per month in Dr. Garcia’s clinic practice and at 
     least once per month in his long-term care/retirement home practice; 
  xi. After a minimum of two (2) months of Phase 2 of Direct Observation, if the 
     Clinical Supervisor is satisfied that Dr. Garcia has the necessary knowledge, 
     skills and judgment to practice in a less highly supervised environment, the 
     Clinical Supervisor may recommend to the College that the direct observation 
     component of supervision be reduced; 
 Phase 3 of Direct Observation 
 xii. Upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor and approval of the 
     College, the direct observation component of Clinical Supervision will be 
     reduced and will take place on the following terms: For the remainder of the 
     Clinical Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor shall directly observe Dr. Garcia 
     in practice for ½ day (3.5 hours) at least once every three (3) months in Dr. 
     Garcia’s clinic practice and at least once every three (3) months in his long-
     term care/retirement home practice; 
 Meetings 
xiii. As set out above in (ii) and (iv), Dr. Garcia and the Clinical Supervisor will 
     meet at least once every week, for a minimum of two (2) months, and at least 
     once every month thereafter. In addition to the elements of chart review 
     described above, meetings will include the following: 
     (a) Prior to meeting with the Clinical Supervisor, Dr. Garcia shall provide the 
        Clinical Supervisor with the audit trail for each patient whose chart is to be 
        reviewed at that meeting, if the chart is maintained in an Electronic 
        Medical Record; 
                                   6 

        (b) The Clinical Supervisor shall discuss with Dr. Garcia any concerns the 
           Supervisor may have arising from the direct observations or review of 
           charts, Prescribing Log or audit trail; 
        (c) The Clinical Supervisor shall make recommendations to Dr. Garcia for 
           practice improvements and shall follow up on same; 
        (d) The Clinical Supervisor shall make recommendations to Dr. Garcia for 
           ongoing professional development and inquire of Dr. Garcia to determine 
           compliance with same;  
        (e) Dr. Garcia shall review and discuss with the Clinical Supervisor the 
           educational resources and College policies set out below in section (k); 
           and 
        (f) Any other activities which the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to Dr. 
           Garcia’s Clinical Supervision. 
  Reporting 
  xiv. The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with 
       patient identifiers; and 
   xv. The Clinical Supervisor will provide reports to the College: 
        (a) At least once every two (2) weeks for the first two (2) months; 
        (b) If the Clinical Supervisor so recommends and subject to the approval of 
           the College, at least once every month thereafter; or  
        (c) More frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about Dr. Garcia’s 
           standard of practice or conduct. 
(k) Dr. Garcia will review and discuss with his Supervisor the following resources: 
    i. CPSO Policy “Prescribing Drugs”: http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
       Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs; 
   ii. 2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain: 
       http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html; 
   iii. CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids: https://www.cmpa-
       acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-
       opioids; 
   iv. the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic Non-Cancer Pain 
       Tool: https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp 
    v. CPSO Policy “Medical Records”:  http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-
       Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;  
   vi. CPSO Policy “Maintaining Appropriate Boundaries”: 
       http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Maintaining-Appropriate-
       Boundaries-and-Preventing 
(l) Dr. Garcia shall abide by the recommendations of the Clinical Supervisor; 
(m) If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking as set out in Schedule “E” to 
   this Order is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Garcia shall, 
   within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking 
   in the same form from a person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is 
   delivered to the College within that time; 
(n) If Dr. Garcia is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with this Order, 
   he shall cease to practice until such time as he has done so; 
                                   7 

(o) Dr. Garcia shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to the College, 
   and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information the Clinical 
   Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical 
   Supervisor’s undertaking and Dr. Garcia’s compliance with this Order; 
(p) Dr. Garcia shall consent to the Clinical Supervisor and/or the College making 
   inquiries of any staff/employees at any of his practice locations in relation to any of 
   the terms of this Order and any aspect of the Clinical Supervision, and shall consent 
   to staff/employees providing information and/or documentation to the Clinical 
   Supervisor and the College, including but not limited to information regarding Dr. 
   Garcia’s charting practices; 
Assessment   
(q) Approximately twelve (12) months after the completion of the period of supervision 
   as set out above, Dr. Garcia shall undergo an assessment of his practice (the 
   “Assessment”) by a College-appointed assessor (the “Assessor(s)”).  The Assessor(s) 
   shall report the results of the Assessment to the College; 
(r) The Assessment shall include both Dr. Garcia’s clinic and long-term care/retirement 
   home practices. The Assessment may include chart reviews, direct observation of Dr. 
   Garcia’s care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients 
   and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.  Dr. Garcia shall abide by all 
   recommendations made by the Assessor(s), and the results of the Assessment will be 
   reported to the College and may form the basis of further action by the College; 
(s) Dr. Garcia shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) of the reports of the 
   Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and shall consent to the sharing of 
   all information between the Clinical Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the College, as 
   the College deems necessary or desirable;   
Other 
(t) Dr. Garcia shall comply with the College Policy on Practice Management 
   Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of 
   Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation in respect of his period of 
   suspension, a copy of which forms Schedule “F” to this Order;  
(u) Dr. Garcia shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices, in 
   any jurisdiction (his “Practice Location(s)”) within fifteen (15) days of this Order 
   and again prior to resuming practice following the suspension of his certificate of 
   registration described above in paragraph 2, and shall inform the College of any and 
   all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that 
   location, until the report of the Assessment has been provided to the College; 
(v) Dr. Garcia shall co-operate  unannounced inspections of his Practice Location(s) and 
   patient charts and to any other activity the College deems necessary for the purpose 
   of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order and shall 
   provide his irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of any 
   person or institution who may have relevant information for the purposes of 
   monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order;  
(w) Dr. Garcia shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario 
   Health Insurance Plan, the Narcotics Monitoring System and/or any person who or 
   institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor his 
   compliance with this Order; 
                                   8 

(x) Dr. Garcia shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing 
   the terms of this Order. 
 
On July 11, 2018 the Committee ordered that: 
 
   -  Dr. Garcia pay to the College costs in the amount of $49,000.00 within 45 days of 
      the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): July 18 - 21, 2016, August 4 - 5, 2016; Penalty Hearing October 10 and 12, 2017, January 24, 25, 26, 2018