THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/03/2019 11:48:18 AM

Fitzgerald, John Peter (CPSO#: 96635)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Supportive Care, Princess Margaret Hospital, 610 University Avenue, Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 03 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2015