Chaparro Mutis, Blanca Cecilia
CPSO#: 68585
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Female
Languages Spoken: English, Spanish
Education: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1983
Practice Information
Vestibulum ante ipsum primis in faucibus orci luctus et ultrices posuere cubilia Curae; Donec velit neque, auctor sit amet aliquam vel, ullamcorper sit amet ligula. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Donec rutrum congue leo eget malesuada. Nulla quis lorem ut libero malesuada feugiat.
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: Jun 26 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis (CPSO# 68585 )
Dr. C. Gutierrez (CPSO# 73272 )
Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Respirology
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 - 132
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4996
Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 6 - 040
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060
Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6507
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital | Location |
---|---|
St Michael's Hospital | Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site | Toronto |
No Hospital Notices reported.
Specialties
Specialty | Issued On | Type |
---|---|---|
Respirology | Effective:05 Jan 2005 | CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action | Issue Date |
---|---|
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate | Effective: 12 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration | Expiry: 11 Oct 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate | Effective: 09 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee | Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate | Effective: 08 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee | Effective: 12 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate | Effective: 05 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee | Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee | Effective: 11 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee | Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee | Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. | Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By | Effective Date | Expiry Date | Status |
---|---|---|---|
Registration Committee | Effective: 20 Jun 2013 | Active |
Dr. Blanca Cecilia Chaparro Mutis may practise medicine independently in respirology, only.