skip to content

Acceptable Qualifying Examinations

Print page icon

Even if you are not a licentiate of the Medical Council of Canada, you may be eligible for a restricted certificate of registration. This may be the case if you have successfully completed one of the following exams:

  1. USMLE Steps 1, 2 and 3. We require Step 2 Clinical Skills (CS) if you took Step 2 after June 12, 2004.
  2. ECFMG certification plus USMLE Step 3. This applies to international medical graduates (IMGs) who passed USMLE Step 2 Clinical Skills Assessment (CSA) between July 1, 1998 and June 14, 2004.
  3. FLEX component 1 and component 2, successfully completed (score of 75 on each component) between January 1, 1992 and December 31, 1994.
  4. NBME Part 1, 2 and 3, successfully completed between January 1, 1992 and December 31, 1994.
  5. The Comprehensive Osteopathic Licensing Examination (COMLEX-USA) Levels 1, 2 and 3. We require the COMLEX-USA Level 2 Performance Evaluation (PE) component if you completed Level 2 after September 2004. (This applies to graduates of osteopathic schools accredited by the American Osteopathic Association.)
  6. Examen Clinique Objectif Structuré (ECOS) of the Collège des Médecins du Québec passed between January 1, 1992 and December 31, 2000.

Your certificate would come with the following terms, conditions and limitations, provided you meet all other criteria for registration:

  1. You must practice with a mentor and/or supervisor until you have successfully completed an assessment.
  2. You must undergo an assessment after completing a minimum of one year of practice in Ontario. The certificate of registration automatically expires 18 months from the date of issuance, but the Registration Committee may renew it with or without terms, conditions and limitations.

The CPSO’s Registration Committee must review all applications submitted under this policy before approval.