skip to content

Processing Times and Meeting Dates

Print page icon

The Registration Committee normally meets once every four to six weeks. Meeting dates for 2022 and corresponding deadlines are listed below.

 

Applications

All incoming applications must undergo initial assessment by the Registration and Membership Services Department. Applications must be assessed and all credentialing documents received by the Registration and Membership Services Department before referral to the Registration Committee. The initial assessment on average takes five weeks given that 150 cases are referred to the Registration Committee monthly.

Applications that include open and past complaints, legal matters, breaks in practice, supervision, questions with corresponding “yes” responses, issues pertaining to section 2 (1) of Ontario Regulation 865/93: Registration, and any applications subject to the Colleges Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Clinic Practice policy  will require additional documentation following the initial assessment to clarify these matters. This will increase the processing time by 5 to 7 weeks at a minimum, depending on the nature of the outstanding requirements. Additional requirements based on individual applications may be requested to facilitate the Committee’s decision.

All applicants whose applications require review by the Registration Committee are provided a complete copy of the documents from their registration file that will be considered by the Registration Committee. These copies are provided to the applicant free of charge.

 

Registration Specialist

The Registration Specialist will ensure that your case is brought forward with sufficient information to make a decision. He or she will produce a document file of relevant information relating to your application on your behalf, including the copying, scanning, collating and pagination of files. The document file is submitted to the Registration Committee, which is comprised of practising members of the profession. The Registration Committee reviews all case materials two weeks prior to the meeting date. Applications that do not fall within the published deadlines (see below) cannot be accommodated.

 

Decision Letters

Decision letters are sent electronically (or hardcopy, by request) within seven business days after the meeting. Once final documents are received, a quality check requiring three individual reviews is performed and your certificate of registration is issued closer to your start date.

 

Interim Meetings

Unscheduled interim meetings of the Registration Committee may occasionally occur between regularly scheduled meetings for review of eligible registration policy-based applications. Such meetings are held subject to time of year, overall Registration Committee caseload, and availability of a committee member quorum. Applicants scheduled for review at these meetings will be notified accordingly.

 

Meeting Dates

Tentative meeting dates corresponding to receipt of your application will be indicated by your Registration Specialist and posted to your online application status account once the initial assessment is complete. Please do not schedule a practice start date until you receive the outcome of your review — doing so will not speed up the process.

2022-23 Credentialing Completion Deadlines

To enable referral to the Registration Committee, all credentialing and supporting documents must be received and assessed by these dates. Should you miss a confirmed deadline, you will be working with the next meeting date deadlines.

Every effort is made on the part of the College to meet the deadlines for the corresponding meeting dates. Nevertheless, these deadlines are not binding on the College and there is no guarantee with respect to scheduling a Registration Committee review. Complex applications requiring more staff preparation time, including those where conduct-related issues have been identified, must often be scheduled for a subsequent meeting date. Registration Committee caseload limitations may also force deferral of an application to a subsequent meeting date. Note we cannot expedite the registration process and standard processing timelines apply.

We encourage you to arrange for the submission of requirements in a timely fashion, as the process is dependent on you to facilitate the review of your application.

Application
received by:
Final documents
assessed by:
 Meeting Date
October 21, 2021 December 9, 2021 January 27, 2022
December 3, 2021 February 1, 2022 March 8, 2022
January 18, 2022 March 16, 2022 April 21, 2022
February 24, 2022 April 18, 2022 May 26, 2022
March 17, 2022 May 12, 2022 June 23, 2022
May 9, 2022 June 21, 2022 August 11, 2022
June 13, 2022 August 8, 2022 September 8, 2022
July 14, 2021 September 6, 2022 October 13, 2022
August 11, 2022 October 6, 2022 November 10, 2022
September 7, 2022 October 27, 2022 December 6, 2022
October 13, 2022 December 8, 2022 January 26, 2023