skip to content

Processing Times and Meeting Dates

Print page icon

The Registration Committee normally meets once every four to six weeks. Meeting dates for 2019 and corresponding deadlines are listed below.

 

Applications

All incoming applications must undergo initial assessment by the Applications and Credentials Department. Applications must be assessed and all credentialing documents received by the Applications and Credentials Department before referral to the Registration Committee. The initial assessment on average takes five weeks given that 150 cases are referred to the Registration Committee monthly.

Applications that include open and past complaints, legal matters, breaks in practice, supervision, issues pertaining to section 2 (1) of Ontario Regulation 865/93: Registration, and any questions with corresponding “yes” responses will require additional documentation following the initial assessment to clarify these matters. This will increase the processing time by 5 to 7 weeks at a minimum, depending on the nature of the outstanding requirements. Additional requirements based on individual applications may be requested to facilitate the Committee’s decision.

All applicants whose applications require review by the Registration Committee are provided a complete copy of the documents from their registration file that will be considered by the Registration Committee. These copies are provided to the applicant free of charge.

 

Coordinator

The Coordinator will ensure that your case is brought forward with sufficient information to make a decision. He or she will produce a document file of relevant information relating to your application on your behalf, including the copying, scanning, collating and pagination of files. The document file is submitted to the Registration Committee, which is comprised of practising members of the profession. The Registration Committee reviews all case materials two weeks prior to the meeting date. Applications that do not fall within the published deadlines (see below) cannot be accommodated.

 

Decision Letters

Decision letters are sent electronically (or hardcopy, by request) within seven business days after the meeting. Once final documents are received, a quality check requiring three individual reviews is performed and your certificate of registration is issued closer to your start date.

 

Interim Meetings

Unscheduled interim meetings of the Registration Committee may occasionally occur between regularly scheduled meetings for review of eligible registration policy-based applications. Such meetings are held subject to time of year, overall Registration Committee caseload, and availability of a committee member quorum. Applicants scheduled for review at these meetings will be notified accordingly.

 

Meeting Dates

Tentative meeting dates corresponding to receipt of your application will be indicated by your coordinator and posted to your online application status account once the initial assessment is complete. Please do not schedule a practice start date until you receive the outcome of your review — doing so will not speed up the process.

2018-19 Credentialing Completion Deadlines

To enable referral to the Registration Committee, all credentialing and supporting documents must be received and assessed by these dates. Should you miss a confirmed deadline, you will be working with the next meeting date deadlines.

Every effort is made on the part of the College to meet the deadlines for the corresponding meeting dates. Nevertheless, these deadlines are not binding on the College and there is no guarantee with respect to scheduling a Registration Committee review. Complex applications requiring more staff preparation time, including those where conduct-related issues have been identified, must often be scheduled for a subsequent meeting date. Registration Committee caseload limitations may also force deferral of an application to a subsequent meeting date.

We encourage you to arrange for the submission of requirements in a timely fashion, as the process is dependent on you to facilitate the review of your application.

Application
received by*:
Final documents
assessed by:
 Meeting Date
October 25, 2018 December 13, 2018 January 24, 2019
December 3, 2018 January 31, 2019 March 7, 2019
January 10, 2019 March 7, 2019 April 11, 2019
February 20, 2019 April 11, 2019 May 16, 2019
March 28, 2019 May 16, 2019 June 20, 2019
May 9, 2019 June 27, 2019 August 1, 2019
June 20, 2019 August 8, 2019 September 12, 2019
July 25, 2019 September 12, 2019 October 17, 2019
August 22, 2019 October 19, 2019 November 14, 2019
September 20, 2019 November 7, 2019 December 12, 2019

 

*Your application fee must be processed by the College’s Finance Department by the above-mentioned date. No initial assessment of your application will be completed until your application fee has been processed.

Decision letters are sent electronically within seven business days after the meeting. Once final documents are received, a quality check requiring three individual reviews is performed and your certificate of registration is issued within five business days.