Please see the Notice of Meeting for the next CPSO Board of Directors meeting, scheduled for Thursday, May 29 and Friday, May 30, 2025. Members of the public who wish to attend in person should register no later than 4:30pm on May 26. Please also review CPSO’s Code of Conduct for Board Meeting Guests.
Upcoming Board Meetings
- Thursday, May 29 and Friday, May 30, 2025
- Thursday, September 25 and Friday, September 26, 2025
- Thursday, November 27 and Friday, November 28, 2025
-
-
- November 28-29, 2024
- September 6, 2024
- May 30-31, 2024
- February 29-March 1, 2024
- Special meeting of the Board: February 16, 2024
-
-
-
-
-
-
-
-