skip to content

Board Updates

Latest news from CPSO's meeting of the Board

Print page icon
  • December 2023

    Changes to our Medical Assistance in Dying approved; update on our Quality Improvement program; no fee increase for the sixth consecutive year.

    September 2023

    An update on governance modernization; approval of our Human Rights and the Provision of Health Services policy; an update on the regulation of physician assistants.

    June 2023

    Addressing physician supply; waiving fees for resident "moonlighting" licence; developing a policy to enable a practice ready assessment program in Ontario.

    March 2023

    Blood-bourne Viruses policy rescinded; addressing physician supply; an update on our Quality Improvement program.

  • December 2022

    Update on our Quality Improvement program, investigations, and the Ontario Physicians & Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.

    September 2022

    Addressing physician resources and and responding to the physician supply shortage; update on the response times of our Patient and Public Help Centre.

    June 2022

    Approval of our Virtual Care and Social Media policies; updates on complaints, discipline, and registration.

    March 2022

    A discussion about complaint trends, the Ontario Physicians & Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, and a parental leave fee reduction.

  • December 2021

    Details on OHP and facility assessments; an update on our accreditation modernization; approval of by-law amendments.

    September 2021

    Update on our response time for complaints, our Out of Hospital Inspections Program, our Quality Improvement Program, and the final approval of our Complementary and Alternative Medicine policy.

    June 2021

    Discussion on CPSO regulating physician assistants, recent numbers on complaints, and our progress on governance modernization.

    March 2021

    Discussion on goals for 2021 and enhancements to the Discipline Committee.

  • December 2020

    Announcement about CPSO oversight of Physician Assistants; changes to Council Elections; no fee increase

    September 2020

    Reduced Fee for Parental Leave; Burnout; Right-Touch Regulation; Policy

    March & May 2020

    Adapting to COVID-19; Policies; Approved Bylaws; New VP; Right-Touch Regulation; Quality Improvement Program

  • December 5-6, 2019

    Hamilton FP New CPSO President; Council Award Recipient: Dr. Michelle Hladunewich.; Registrar/CEO’s Report;  Strategic Plan KPIs; No fee increase; Council Elections; Boundary Violations; Prescribing Drugs; Disclosure of Harm; Preliminary consultations; Check out e-Dialogue!

    September 20, 2019

    Dr. Mark Spiller receives Council Award; Registrar/CEO’s Report; Continuity of Care; Closing a Medical Practice; Policy Redesign Implementation; Effective Referral; CPR Orders; Governance Update; Transparency; Criminal Record Search; Feedback Wanted; By-law Amendments

    May 30-31, 2019

    Teeswater Family Practitioner Honoured; Registrar/CEO’s Report; Strategic Plan; Policy Redesign Implementation – Batch 1; Policies – External consultations; Cayton Report; Patient Partnership; Governance Update; Posting Criminal Charges and Findings of Guilt from Other Jurisdictions – bylaw circulation

    March 1, 2019

    Pediatric Rheumatologist Honoured with Council Award; Registrar/CEO Report; Quality Improvement/Quality Assurance; Logo Update; Registration Policies; Certain Fees to be Removed from By-Law; Increase in Costs Ordered in Discipline Hearings; Open Consultations

  • December 6-7, 2018

    New CPSO President — Dr. Peeter Poldre; New Chief Medical Advisor Announced; Right Touch Regulation; Traditional Land Acknowledgement; CPSO Governance Review; No Membership Fee Increase for 2019; Policy Redesign; MAID – New Federal Regulations; General By-law Amendments

    September 7, 2018

    Council Award Recipient – Dr. Jason Malinowski; New Registrar Identifies Areas of Focus; New Direction for Opioid Strategy; Development of Strategic Plan; CPSO Governance Review; Delegating Statutory Powers; General By-law Amendments; Consultations Underway – Have Your Say

    May 24-25, 2018

    Council Award Presented to Dr. Sarah Reid; Continuity of Care - Draft for Consultation; Bill 87: Psychotherapy Regulation Proposal; Rescindment of Methadone By-Law; Governance Review

    February 23, 2018

    Council Award Presented to Dr. Bill Wong; Policy Consultation on Closing a Medical Practice; College Releases Interim Opioid Investigation Update; Governance Review; Increase in Costs Ordered in Discipline Hearings; Reporting a Change of Scope, Re-entering Practice; Public Health Emergencies; Continuity of Care and Test Results Management Policy Development; Fee Increase Approved

  • November 30 - December 1, 2017

    New College President; Dr. Kenneth Fung receives Council Award; Uninsured Services: Billing and Block Fees Policy Approved; 2018 Budget; Registration Pathways Program Evaluation; Bill 160, Schedule 9 Oversight of Health Facilities and Devices Act, 2017 ; Prescribing Drugs – Preliminary Consultation; Find out how your opioid prescribing compares to your peers

    September 8, 2017

    Council Award winner; interim opioid strategy; new consultations; facilitating public member presidents; new member orientation; four district 10 physicians acclaimed to Council; Annual Report

    May 25-26, 2017

    Dr. Gary Smith Receives Council Award; Opioid Strategy; Preliminary Consultation Underway; Two Policies Updated; Other News

    February 24, 2017

    Dr. Shazia Ambreen Receives Council Award; Have Your Say on Uninsured Services Policy; Bill 87 — The Protecting Patients' Act; Fertility Clinic Oversight; Other News