Abdel-Bary, Mona Abdel-Moez Mohamed (CPSO#: 74419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 OSBORNE ROAD NE
UNITY PROFESSIONAL BUILDING
SUITE 255
FRIDLEY MN  55432-2774
United States
Phone: 763-236-2500
Fax: 763-236-2505
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mona Abdel-Bary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 25 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA ABDEL-MOEZ MOHAMED ABDEL-BARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-BARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Dec 1999 to 05 Jan 2000
Elective Trainee - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2000 to 24 Jul 2000
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2000 to 08 Dec 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2001