Abdollah, Hoshiar (CPSO#: 31367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3380
Fax: (613) 548-1387
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Abdollah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdollah ( CPSO# 31367 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Belgium

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOSHIAR ABDOLLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDOLLAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1980