Abdulali, Mufaddal (CPSO#: 97712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fountain Medical and Wellness
9625 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone: (905) 237 - 75
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trinity Medical and Travel Clinic
18120 Yonge Street
East Gwillimbury ON  L9N 0J3
Canada
Phone: 905 895 0008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mufaddal Abdulali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdulali ( CPSO# 97712 )

Business Address:
Unimedico Family Practice
Suite 110
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-3300

Business Address:
Suite 12
205 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 495-2254

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUFADDAL ABDULALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULALI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2014