Abdulla, Alykhan Sadrudin (CPSO#: 65052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kachchi

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Kingsway Health Centre
Box 819
5542 Ann Street First Floor
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdulla ( CPSO# 65052 )

Business Address:
The Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Ann Street, 1st Floor
P.O. Box 819
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 692-5433

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALYKHAN SADRUDIN ABDULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993