Abdulmajid Al Hamami, Ihsan Ali (CPSO#: 76760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 West Mississauga Medical
Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 785-3627
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulmajid Al Hamami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Abdulmajid Al Hamami ( CPSO# 76760 )

Business Address:
100 - 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 785-3627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IHSAN ALI ABDULMAJID AL HAMAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULMAJID AL HAMAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003