Abeysinghe, Nilanga (CPSO#: 92265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: Abeysinghe, Abeysinghe Mudiyanselage Nilanga (used until: 31 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 474-2106
Fax: (705) 474-6613
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nilanga Abeysinghe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abeysinghe ( CPSO# 92265 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 474-2109

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NILANGA ABEYSINGHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABEYSINGHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Nov 2009 to 07 Feb 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 08 Feb 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2012