Abouelnasr, Wahid Aly (CPSO#: 61865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

St Joseph Care Group
Bethammi Nursing Home
63 Carrie Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4J2
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Abouelnasr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abouelnasr ( CPSO# 61865 )

Business Address:
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 778-1496

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6425

Business Address:
63 Carrie Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 6C2
Phone Number: (807) 344-3422

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAHID ALY ABOUELNASR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUELNASR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1996
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jun 2007

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Apr 2008
Summary:

 On April 7, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Wahid Aly Abouelnasr has committed an act of professional misconduct under 
 paragraph 1(1)34 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that he engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician.  The 
 Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following:

1.	Dr. Abouelnasr attend and 
 successfully complete the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario's Medical Ethics and 
 Informed Consent course, at his own expense, within 90 days of the date of this order.

2.	Dr. 
 Abouelnasr send forthwith an apology letter to the CEO of the North York General Hospital and to 
 the complainant.

3.	Dr. Abouelnasr appear before the Panel to be reprimanded.

4.	Dr. Abouelnasr 
 pay costs to the College in the amount of $1,800.00 within 30 days of the date of this 
 Order.

5.	The results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 07, 2008


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Nov 2006
Summary:

 On November 8, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Wahid Aly Abouelnasr committed professional misconduct in that he has engaged in 
 conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional. 

1.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Abouelnasr(s 
 certificate of registration for six months commencing December 1, 2006.

2.	The Discipline 
 Committee orders Dr. Abouelnasr to pay to the College costs in the amount of $1,250.

3.	The 
 Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 08, 2006