Abrahamson, Simon Denis (CPSO#: 33649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Shuter Wing Suite 1 026
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5071
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Abrahamson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abrahamson ( CPSO# 33649 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Shuter Wing Suite 1-026
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMON DENIS ABRAHAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1986