Abudhaileh, Hani Abdelkader (CPSO#: 80176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aramco Medical center
Abqaiq 31311
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966035772772
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Abudhaileh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANI ABDELKADER ABUDHAILEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUDHAILEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003