Abuzgaya, Fathi El Hadi (CPSO#: 55140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone: (905) 686-0882
Fax: (905) 686-7940
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ajax and Pickering Hospital
Fracture Clinic
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1478
Fax: (905) 683-4657
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abuzgaya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abuzgaya ( CPSO# 55140 )

Business Address:
207 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 686-0882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATHI EL HADI ABUZGAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUZGAYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1995