Acker, John Jacob (CPSO#: 42794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 301
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 298-0111
Fax: (416) 298-1574
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John J. Acker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Acker ( CPSO# 42794 )

Business Address:
301 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JACOB ACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ACKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1985