Adam, George Andrew (CPSO#: 27439)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George A. Adam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 20 2013

Medical Records Location

Address: North York General Hospital, 4001 Leslie Street, Toronto, ON M2K 1E1
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015