Adamiak, Anna (CPSO#: 89891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Adamiak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adamiak ( CPSO# 89891 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
CC Wing
4th Floor, Room W4110
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA ADAMIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMIAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 05 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2010