Adenwala, Tasneem Hushnen (CPSO#: 87839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Topiwala National Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Bolton Walk In Clinic
15, Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 2B8
Phone: (905) 951-1234
Fax: (905) 951-6090
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Road Medical Centre
7160 Markham Road
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7400
Fax: (905) 472 9009
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Tuscany Medical Centre
9100 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 760-1140
Fax: (905) 760-5587
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T Adenwala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Adenwala ( CPSO# 87839 )

Business Address:
Tuscany Medical Centre
9100 Jane Street
Suite 105
Building A
Vaughan ON  L4K 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 760-1140

Business Address:
Markham Road Medical Centre
7160 Markham Avenue
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Phone Number: (905) 472-7400

Business Address:
15 Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 2B5
Phone Number: (905) 951-1234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TASNEEM HUSHNEN ADENWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADENWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009