Adey, Christopher Karl (CPSO#: 30842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CMR Healthcare
Suite 120
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 255-1265
Fax: (519) 256-0265
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CMR Healthcare
1-700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-4515
Fax: (519) 250-9652
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. K. Adey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Adey ( CPSO# 30842 )

Business Address:
CML Healthcare
1-700 Tecumseh Road East
Lower Level
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 258-4515

Business Address:
2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 120
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 255-1265

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KARL ADEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1981