Adhikari, Neill Kumar John (CPSO#: 74332)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Critical Care Medicine
Room D1 08
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4522
Fax: (416) 480-4999
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adhikari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Adhikari ( CPSO# 74332 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Critical Care Medicine
Room D1 08
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEILL KUMAR JOHN ADHIKARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADHIKARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2001