Adler, Reva Nan (CPSO#: 96528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:State University of New York-Stony Brook, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
1 Brigepoint Way
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone: (416) 461-8252 Ext. 3709
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reva N. Adler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adler ( CPSO# 96528 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
Division of Geriatric medicine
1 Bridgepoint Way
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 565-4624

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REVA NAN ADLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011