Adlington, Jay Beverley (CPSO#: 81893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 7102
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2663
Fax: (519) 376-4163
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jay Adlington and Dr. Stephanie Cote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adlington ( CPSO# 81893 )
Dr. S. Cote ( CPSO# 92003 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
7102 - 1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2663

Business Address:
Collingwood Dermatology & Aesthetics
1 Huron Street
Suite 204
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1C3
Phone Number: (705) 293-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAY BEVERLEY ADLINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADLINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2004 to 07 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2007