Adly, Elaheh (CPSO#: 87945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
McMaster University
HSC-2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75166
Fax: 905-523-1224
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: 1-519-751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

1142 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON  L9G3K9
Canada
Phone: 905-304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elaheh Adly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Adly ( CPSO# 87945 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
HSC-2V2
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Business Address:
1142 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-0062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAHEH ADLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015