Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Aeta, Hany Abdelsalam Mansour Mohamed (CPSO#: 59827)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
1220 Place D'Orleans Drive
Suite 100
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: (613) 841-5393
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aeta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aeta ( CPSO# 59827 )

Business Address:
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 100
1220 Place D'Orleans Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 841-5389

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANY ABDELSALAM MANSOUR MOHAMED AETA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AETA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991