Agarwal, Ragini Kalpana (CPSO#: 75545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of London, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
David Braley Health Sciences Centre
3rd Floor, 100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 546 9885
Fax: (905) 972 8903
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Agarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Agarwal ( CPSO# 75545 )

Business Address:
McMaster Family Practice
3rd Floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAGINI KALPANA AGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2001