Agate, William Arthur (CPSO#: 52689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Health Centre of Maple
1-2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3L2
Phone: (905) 832-3838 Ext. 1
Fax: (905) 832-9097
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Agate Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Agate ( CPSO# 52689 )

Business Address:
The Health Centre of Maple
1 - 2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 3L2
Phone Number: (908) 832-3838

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM ARTHUR AGATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGATE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1986