Aggarwal, Shilpa (CPSO#: 72240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic
701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 4T7
Phone: (519) 660-5199
Fax: (519) 660-5357
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Intercommunity Health Centre
659 Dundas St
London ON  N5W 2Y8
Canada
Phone: 519 660-0874
Fax: 519-642-1532
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 72240 )

Business Address:
Medical Clinic
701 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5Y 4T7
Phone Number: (519) 660-5199

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHILPA AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2000