Ahuja, Nina (CPSO#: 72814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Names: Saini, Nina Ahuja (used until: 21 Nov 2004 )     Ahuja, Nina (used until: 29 Aug 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
536 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1A6
Phone: (905) 575-7050
Fax: (905) 297-7597
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Canada
Phone: (905) 573-7777
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Ahuja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ahuja ( CPSO# 72814 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-4848

Business Address:
536 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 575-7050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NINA AHUJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHUJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003