Ainslie, Liane (CPSO#: 100994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Villano, Liane (used until: 19 Sep 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Espanola Family Health Team
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone: (705) 862-7991
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liane Ainslie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ainslie ( CPSO# 100994)

Business Address:
Espanola Family Health Team
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1R4
Phone Number: (705) 869-1420

Business Address:
801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1T2
Phone Number: (705) 862-7991

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANE AINSLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AINSLIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015