Akbari, Ayub (CPSO#: 73060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82537
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Akbari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akbari ( CPSO# 73060 )

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus Suite 5-25
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 29 Apr 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYUB AKBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKBARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 1998 to 13 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1999