Akinlosotu, Adewale Anthony (CPSO#: 92222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hausa, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
860 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 2S5
Phone: (519) 567-3323
Fax: (226) 221-8383
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5100
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Crisis Centre
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030, Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: (519) 973-0210
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Akinlosotu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Akinlosotu ( CPSO# 92222 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Crisis Centre
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5100

Business Address:
102 - 860 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 2S5
Phone Number: (519) 567-3323

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
Nigeria
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEWALE ANTHONY AKINLOSOTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINLOSOTU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2014