Akyurekli, Deniz (CPSO#: 66730)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Turkish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone: (519) 371-5769
Fax: (519) 371-8708
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

431 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2A 4C9
Canada
Phone: (613) 728-1008
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Grey Bruce Regional Health
Services
1800 8th Street East
P O Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Canada
Phone: (519) 376-2121
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deniz Akyurekli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Akyurekli ( CPSO# 66730 )

Business Address:
Suite 250
10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 371-5769

Business Address:
431 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K2A 4C9
Phone Number: (613) 728-1008

Business Address:
Suite 203
10 Keith Avenue
Collingwood ON  L9Y 0W5
Phone Number: (705) 445-1007

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seen up until May 29, 2015, may contact: Dr. Deniz Akyurekli Centre for Personal Enhancement 250 10th Street East Owen Sound, ON N4K 1S4 Telephone: 519-371-5769
Date Received: 19 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENIZ AKYUREKLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKYUREKLI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1998