Al Enazi, Meteb Hamed K (CPSO#: 86063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sleep and Alertness Clinic
790 BAY STREET
Suite 800
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 603-5075
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

720 Spadina Ave.
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Canada
Phone: (647) 629-8883
Fax: (647) 689-2170
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. METEB HAMED K AL ENAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL ENAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015