Al-Ali, Kaes Abdul-Settar (CPSO#: 85954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: Ali, Kaes Abdul Settar Mohammed (used until: 11 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saddam College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone: (905) 373-4366
Fax: (905) 373-0687
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 372-6811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaes Al-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Al-Ali ( CPSO# 85954 )

Business Address:
209 - 1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone Number: (905) 373-4366

Business Address:
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAES ABDUL-SETTAR AL-ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 14 Feb 2007 to 20 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2011