Al-Arabi, Ayman Mohammed Ahmed (CPSO#: 74081)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MCI The Doctor's Office
Atrium on Bay
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone: (416) 598-1703
Fax: (416) 598-1778
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayman Al-Arabi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Arabi ( CPSO# 74081 )

Business Address:
595 Bay Street
Atrium on Bay MCI The Doctor's Office
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 598-1703

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYMAN MOHAMMED AHMED AL-ARABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ARABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2003