AlAsaad, Hani Ghalib Mohammed (CPSO#: 99306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 306
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 737-0830
Fax: (705) 737-0679
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alasaad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. AlAsaad ( CPSO# 99306 )

Business Address:
LMC Diabetes and Endocrinology
Suite 306
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 737-0830

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANI GHALIB MOHAMMED ALASAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALASAAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015