Al-Hesayen, Abdurrahman Omar Sulaiman (CPSO#: 68401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6 036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5399
Fax: (416) 864-5416
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Heart Centre
906-2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Al-Hesayen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Al-Hesayen ( CPSO# 68401 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5952

Business Address:
Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Phone Number: (647) 776-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 13 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDURRAHMAN OMAR SULAIMAN AL-HESAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HESAYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 06 Jul 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003