Alam, Asimul (CPSO#: 86825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Room M3 200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 680-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly St #01
Toronto, ON
M4S 3C3
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Mississauga ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akhtar and Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 86508 )
Dr. A. Alam ( CPSO# 86825 )

Business Address:
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-2864

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
399 Bathurst Street - West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
Unit 601
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Business Address:
Unit 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIMUL ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012