Alam, Huma Aftab (CPSO#: 81410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
659 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Phone: (519) 660-0874
Fax: (519) 642 1532
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oxford Medical Walk-In Clinic
Suite 102
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-4999
Fax: (519) 433-4151
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huma A. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Alam ( CPSO# 81410 )

Business Address:
659 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 2Z1
Phone Number: (519) 660-0874

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Walk-In Clinic
102 - 140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 433-4999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMA AFTAB ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)