Alba, Ana Carolina (CPSO#: 92035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2023

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of Cuyo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Room 6N-220
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-8193
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ana Carolina Alba may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Cardiology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Alba
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Alba  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Alba's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Alba's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2023.