Albert, Shelley Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55696)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
3rd Floor
1929 Bayview Ave.
North York ON  M4G 3E8
Phone: (416) 480-5590
Fax: (416) 480-4571
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. E. Albert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Grief ( CPSO# 69099 )
Dr. S. Albert ( CPSO# 55696 )

Business Address:
1929 Bayveiw Avenue
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4G 3E8
Phone Number: (416) 580-5590

Business Address:
Baycrest Geriatric Health Care System
3560 Bathurst Street
4C91D
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY ELIZABETH ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1987