Aldis, Hugh Warren (CPSO#: 31600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Fax: (705) 743-1713
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Dept. of Diagnostic Imaging
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140


Corporation Name: Aldis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Civic Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH WARREN ALDIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980