Aldridge, Christopher John (CPSO#: 77901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice and Chronic
Pain Management
Suite 202
688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone: (416) 463-4632
Fax: (416) 463-4639
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pape Medical Centre ( Urgent Care )
1018 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3V9
Canada
Phone: (416) 429-6668
Fax: (416) 429-0022
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Aldridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Aldridge ( CPSO# 77901 )

Business Address:
Family Practice and Chronic Pain Management
202 - 688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 463-4632

Business Address:
1018 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 429-6668

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN ALDRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004