Aleksandrova, Iryna Gennadievna (CPSO#: 86894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: (705) 726-0822
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iryna Aleksandrova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Aleksandrova ( CPSO# 86894 )

Business Address:
302 - 1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G5
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 924-9760

Business Address:
400 - 145 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 451-5855

Business Address:
186 St. George Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2N3
Phone Number: (416) 479-4244

Business Address:
1148 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6J 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 849-7560

Business Address:
The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Department of Anaesthesia
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L2M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 797-1111

Business Address:
100 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 834-6640

Business Address:
131 Bloor Street West
Unit 210
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 323-4212

Business Address:
3200 Dufferin Street
Unit 505
Toronto ON  M6A 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 256-9500

Business Address:
40 Holly Street
Unit 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
330 Highway 7 East
Unit 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
3583 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Unit 201
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
7700 Bathurst Street
Unit 49
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 763-1107

Business Address:
70 Yorkille Avenue
Unit 31
Toronto ON  M5R 1B9
Phone Number: (647) 343-0204

Business Address:
1188B Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 785-7864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRYNA GENNADIEVNA ALEKSANDROVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEKSANDROVA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011