Alexander, Kunniparampil Ninan (CPSO#: 55084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Lab Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58722
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K N Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alexander ( CPSO# 55084 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Lab Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital Campus
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2100

Business Address:
101 Humber College Bouelvard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUNNIPARAMPIL NINAN ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2001