Alexander, Michael (CPSO#: 50325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: Buttoo, Manmohan Singh (used until: 13 Jul 1995 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 11
4728 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H9
Phone: (905) 374-1405
Fax: 289-296-2492
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Alexander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alexander ( CPSO# 50325 )

Business Address:
Suite 11
4728 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H9
Phone Number: (905) 374-1405

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1983